Dogfen lywodraethu THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/10/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/07/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/07/2012 as amended on 19 Aug 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE:- 1. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF BASIC SCIENCE UNDERPINNING CLINICAL RESEARCH AND ITS TRANSLATION INTO IMPROVING ILL HEALTH CAUSED BY RHEUMATIC AND RELATED MUSCULOSKELETAL DISEASES; AND 2. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF CLINICAL AND SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY AND RELATED MUSCULOSKELETAL DISEASES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.