Trosolwg o’r elusen BEXLEY & DARTFORD SAMARITANS
Rhif yr elusen: 219432-40
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 19/07/1977
AS AMENDED ON 12/05/1981
AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2004
AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2006
AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BEXLEY AND DARTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION, AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS.
Maes buddion
DARTFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 22 Mawrth 1978: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- BEXLEY AND DARTFORD SAMARITANS (Enw gwaith)
- THE SAMARITANS AT BEXLEY AND DARTFORD (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.