Dogfen lywodraethu THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/06/1978 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 21/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2011 as amended on 13 Aug 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENT AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, AND TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RECONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS IN THE COLLECTION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.