Dogfen lywodraethu SANDFORD ST MARTIN (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1978, AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 22 OCTOBER 1981, 30 SEPTEMBER 1998, AND BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 JULY 2006. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26 JUL 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROMOTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF RELIGION: (A) BY MEANS OF CHRISTIAN AND OTHER RELIGIOUS BROADCASTING THROUGH RADIO AND TELEVISION, FILM, THE INTERNET, VISUAL AIDS AND OTHER METHODS OF VISUAL, ORAL AND ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION; (B) BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.