CTF TRAINING
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To support charity projects having beneficiaries mostly from geographical areas linked with CTFs past operations in North/Mid England and Wales. In this respect the operational base of the supported charity projects is irrelevant. The projects must have objectives to advance the education and welfare of young persons, advance the education of persons of any age and to assist unemployed persons.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 22 Mawrth 1979: Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Ebrill 2023: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- COMMUNITY TASK FORCE (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.31k | £1.15k | £745 | £82 | £2.68k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.50k | £5.26k | £4.48k | £7.93k | £9.96k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORP. 25 JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 14 AUGUST 1986,16 JULY 1982,6 APRIL 1988,3 MAY 1989, 6 SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 25TH AUGUST 1993
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF ANY AGE BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING,RETRAINING, AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE. (III) TO ASSIST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OF WHATEVER AGE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, RETRAINING AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THROUGH ANY GOVERNMENT SPONSORED OR APPROVED PROGRAMMES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window