Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSTITUTION OF ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 1972 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 FEBRUARY 1979, 8 FEBRUARY 1989, 1 MARCH 1995 AND 7 MARCH 2006 as amended on 17 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance environmental protection and improvement by promoting a scientific approach to understanding and ensuring the conservation of the physical and natural environment. To advance the education of the public by the provision of research and coordination of education, and to engage with those professionally concerned with environmental work, education or studies.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.