Dogfen lywodraethu Deaf Choices UK Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JUNE 2000 & 28 SEPTEMBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 OCT 2017 as amended on 06 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE DEVELOPMENT, STANDARDISATION, PROPAGATION, DISSEMINATION, TEACHING AND USE OF CUED SPEECH AS DESIGNED AND CONCEIVED BY DR ORIN CORNETT TO ENABLE THE DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE TO LEARN NOT ONLY LIP-READING IN ANY LANGUAGE BUT ALSO THE PARTICULAR LANGUAGE ITSELF. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.