Dogfen lywodraethu WHITE LODGE CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/10/1981 AS AMENDED ON 13/3/1995, 19/9/2000 & 27/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JAN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT (INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO PARENTS AND CARERS) IN THE COUNTIES OF SURREY AND HAMPSHIRE AND BERKSHIRE (OR IN THE EVENT OF ANY LOCAL GOVERNMENT REORGANISATION IN AN EQUIVALENT AREA) AND SOUTH WEST LONDON AND OTHER SURROUNDING DISTRICTS OF PERSONS WITH ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY OR OTHER DISABILITY.
Maes buddion
COUNTIES OF SURREY AND HAMPSHIRE AND BERKSHIRE AND SOUTH WEST LONDON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.