Dogfen lywodraethu LONDON SKILLS FOR GROWTH LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/08/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/08/2006 NOW ARTICLES ACCEPTED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 OCT 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT OR WHO ARE IN EMPLOYMENT BUT REQUIRE FURTHER TRAINING TO WORK SATISFACTORY IN THIS EMPLOYMENT, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.