Dogfen lywodraethu The Food Museum
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/04/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/12/2008 as amended on 11 Mar 2022 as amended on 11 Mar 2022 as amended on 18 Jul 2022 as amended on 20 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance the education of the public in the area of East Anglia in its social, cultural, industrial and technological heritage, as well as on health and wellbeing and nature and the environment, by the provision of a Museum that connects the people with where food comes from and the impact of our food choices: past, present and future.
Maes buddion
EAST ANGLIA INCL. SUFFOLK, ESSEX, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND NORFOLK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.