THE QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY AND DORSET GARRISON CHARITY

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
(1) Promoting the welfare of serving and former territorial soldiers through benevolent grants (2) Educating the public by preserving and displaying artefacts relating to the history of the Yeomanry (3) Promoting the welfare of serving territorial soldiers with sporting and social activities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2024
Pobl

9 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Dorset
Llywodraethu
- 28 Hydref 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- CHARITIES I.C.W QUEENS OWN DORSET YEOMANRY + DORSET GARRISON (Enw blaenorol)
- Buddsoddi
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
9 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant General Arundell David Leakey CMG CBE | Cadeirydd | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Adams | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Captain Retired Allan James Wood | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomas Griffiths | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judi Roberts | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LT COL SIMON WALTON LEDGER | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Paul Plumb | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Albert Parr MBE | Ymddiriedolwr | 24 October 2013 |
|
|||||
CAPT THE VISCOUNT FITZHARRIS | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £4.82k | £3.92k | £3.11k | £3.13k | £3.10k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.35k | £2.25k | £5.27k | £2.60k | £2.16k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2024 | 07 Ebrill 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2023 | 22 Mawrth 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2022 | 09 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2021 | 29 Ebrill 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2020 | 08 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1999 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 AUGUST 2000, 18 NOVEMBER 2001, 31 AUGUST 2006 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE CAPITAL AND THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN ALL OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- 1) SO FAR AS REQUISITE IN OR TOWARDS HOUSING, SAFEKEEPING, DISPLAYING, REPAIRING OR REPLACING THE CHATTELS BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND THE COSTS OF INSURING THE SAME IN ACCORDANCE WITH TH PROVISIONS HEREINBEFORE CONTAINED. 2) IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS, AND WHO ARE MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS OF THE SUCCESSOR UNITS OR FORMER OR SERVING MEMBERS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER OR SERVING MEMBERS OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OR OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY WHICH SHALL INCORPORATE IN ITS NAME OR DESIGNATION AND SHALL USE THE TITLE "QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY" OR "DORSET YEOMANRY" BUT IF THERE SHALL BE NO SUCH REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OR OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY WHICH IS AT TIME STATIONED AND SERVING WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DORSET. 3) IN SUPPORTING OR PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OR OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY WHICH SHALL INCORPORATE IN ITS NAME AND USE THE TITLE "QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY' OR "DORSET YEOMANRY" BUT IF THERE SHALL BE NO SUCH REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT THEN OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY, THE CADET FORCE OR THE COMBINED CADET FORCE WHICH IS AT ANY TIME STATIONED AND SERVING WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DORSET. 4) IN MAKING GRANTS TO SUCH CHARITIES CONNECTED WITH THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 5) IN PURCHASING ARTEFACTS AND DOCUMENTS WHICH ENHANCE THE HISTORY OF THE QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Ramshill Farm
Manston
STURMINSTER NEWTON
Dorset
DT10 1HD
- Ffôn:
- 07775 440241
- E-bost:
- simon@simonledger.co.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window