Dogfen lywodraethu BRE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY VARIOUS SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 15 MAR 2002 (EFFECTIVE FROM 1 APR 2002), 4 DEC 2007 AND 3 NOV 2010. as amended on 29 May 2019 as amended on 29 May 2019 as amended on 29 May 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2. Objects 2.1 The objects of the Charity are: 2.1.1 to undertake, commission and support research in areas of science, engineering, information technology, management and economics associated with the built environment, including its processes and artefacts, 2.1.2 to advance knowledge, innovation, and communication, and to promote education and excellence, in all such matters, and to collect, collate and publish useful information ideas, and data relating thereto, and 2.1.3 to undertake, commission, facilitate and support such other activities and services as are beneficial to the built environment and charitable in law in accordance with the law of England and Wales provided that it will not include any purpose which is not charitable in accordance with s.7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005. For the avoidance of doubt, the system of law governing the constitution of the Charity is the law of England and Wales.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.