Dogfen lywodraethu SHERBORNE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/11/1935 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/02/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CARRY ON A SCHOOL IN SHERBOURNE IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET FOR PROVIDING A SOUND AND SYSTEMATIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR GIRLS AND/OR BOYS, WHEREIN SHALL BE TAUGHT THE DUTIES AND DOCTRINES OF CHRISTIANITY AS THE SAME ARE RECEIVED, UNDERSTOOD AND TAUGHT BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; AND/OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THESE OBJECTS AS THE GOVERNORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.