Dogfen lywodraethu THE JOYCE FRANKLAND TRUST, NEWPORT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 28/01/1910 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/11/1921 ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT 06/09/1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/08/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/07/1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11/01/2016 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUL 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL IN, OR NEAR, NEWPORT, IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE SCHOOL) FOR BOYS AND GIRLS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.