Dogfen lywodraethu Town Close Educational Trust Ltd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/10/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/06/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/09/2011 as amended on 08 Jul 2021 as amended on 08 Jul 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE (UNDER THE AGE OF 21 THROUGH THE PROVISION, SUPPORT, CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A DAY AND/OR BOARDING SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AND SUCH OTHER ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.