Dogfen lywodraethu ST CHRISTOPHER'S SCHOOL (HAMPSTEAD) LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2014 as amended on 24 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS ST CHRISTOPHER'S SCHOOL BELSIZE LANE HAMPSTEAD AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.