Dogfen lywodraethu BUTTLE UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DATED 26/03/1971 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/08/1974 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/02/1988 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05/09/2006 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 01/07/2010 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 17/03/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE MAINTENANCE, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF BENEFICIARIES, THAT IS TO SAY, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WOULD BE SO RESIDENT BUT FOR THE FACT THAT THEIR PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE OR WERE TEMPORARY RESIDENT ELSEWHERE AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR (A) BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE OR WERE ADOPTED CHILDREN, (B) BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE ILLEGITIMATE, HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS OR ARE OR HAVE BEEN OTHERWISE DEPRIVED OF NORMAL FAMILY LIFE
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.