Dogfen lywodraethu THE UNITED WORLD COLLEGES (INTERNATIONAL)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19/6/1967 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 15 /10/ 1967, 2 / 7/ 1969, 14 / 7/ 1971, 25 /10/ 1991, 9 /10/ 2001, 25/10/ 2008 & CERTIFICATES OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/ 7/1969 & 12/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 OCT 2017 as amended on 29 Nov 2018 as amended on 08 Sep 2020 as amended on 12 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND IN PARTICULAR:- (A) THE EDUCATION OF YOUTH IN LEADERSHIP, LOYALTY, RESPONSIBILITY AND RESPECT FOR AND UNDERSTANDING OF HUMAN DIGNITY, LIFE AND RIGHTS AND (B) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION IN EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.