Dogfen lywodraethu THE LOCAL POPULATION STUDIES SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/07/1981 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/1985 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2012 as amended on 13 Apr 2019 as amended on 17 Apr 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) PROMOTE THE STUDY OF LOCAL HISTORICAL DEMOGRAPHY AND ASSOCIATED SOCIOLOGICAL, ECONOMIC AND HISTORICAL TOPICS; (II) PROMOTE EDUCATION IN LOCAL HISTORICAL DEMOGRAPHY AND ASSOCIATED TOPICS IN UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES OF FURTHER EDUCATION, OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC; (III) PROMOTE RESEARCH IN THE FIELDS DESCRIBED ABOVE; (IV) PROVIDE A BOOK CLUB TO FURTHER THE AIMS OF THE SOCIETY LAID OUT ABOVE. THE NAME OF THE SOCIETY'S BOOK CLUB SHALL BE THE LOCAL POPULATION HISTORY BOOK CLUB; (V) PUBLISH A JOURNAL CALLED LOCAL POPULATION STUDIES AND OTHER OCCASIONAL PUBLICATIONS REPORTING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.