Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH ACCREDITATION COUNCIL FOR INDEPENDENT FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 OCT 2017 as amended on 02 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
BAC'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: PROVIDING A SYSTEM OF ACCREDITATION FOR EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE PUBLIC CONFIDENCE IN SUCH INSTITUTIONS AND THEIR PROGRAMMES OF STUDY; AND ASSISTING IN THE IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE STANDARDS OF ACCREDITED INSTITUTIONS THROUGH THE OFFER OF ADVISORY AND CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRINCIPALLY IN THE FIELD OF FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.