Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH HYDROLOGICAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 327488

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 01/12/1985 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/1987 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2013 as amended on 18 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN ACCORDANCE WITH GUIDANCE ON PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE INTEREST AND SCHOLARSHIP IN BOTH THE SCIENTIFIC AND THE APPLIED ASPECTS OF HYDROLOGY AND TO FOSTER THE INVOLVEMENT OF ITS MEMBERS IN INTERNATIONAL ACTIVITIES DIRECTED TO THE PROMOTION OF SUCH SCHOLARSHIP.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.