Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR ALLERGY & CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 2022 as amended on 03 Oct 2022 as amended on 07 Oct 2023 as amended on 05 Oct 2024 as amended on 05 Oct 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; TO WORK TOWARDS THE RECOGNITION OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY AS SPECIALISED BRANCHES OF MEDICINE AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PUBLICATION OF ORIGINAL CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE STUDY OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.