CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL EUROPE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL EUROPE, TEACHES, PREACHES AND PROPAGATES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Colombia
- Denmarc
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Hwngari
- Ireland
- Norwy
- Rwmania
- Slofenia
- Unol Daleithiau
- Yr Alban
- Yr Almaen
- Yr Iseldiroedd
Llywodraethu
- 19 Chwefror 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1192589 PROPHETIC VOICE
- 09 Awst 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- 19 Chwefror 2024: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (GI))
Dim enwau eraill
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £356.96k | £376.87k | £288.37k | £140.81k | £206.07k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £329.14k | £398.97k | £264.53k | £142.08k | £96.51k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 17 Mai 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 17 Mai 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 24 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 24 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 22 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 22 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 26 Ionawr 2021 | 87 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 26 Ionawr 2021 | 87 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JANUARY 1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIMES AS THE FOUNDER MAY BY NOTICE IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE AND FOR THE TIME BEING AND UNTIL SUCH FURTHER NOTICE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITIES OF THE FOREGOING (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS PARTICULARLY (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) FOR THE PURPOSE OF TRAINING AND EQUIPPING IN CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP, MISSION AND MINISTRY (D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLDS WHERE THE CHARITY MAY BE OPERATING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT SUBJECT TO THE APPROVAL OF THE FOUNDER IN EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window