Dogfen lywodraethu VOICEABILITY ADVOCACY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 JULY 1999, 31 MAY 2002, 29 JULY 2005 29 AUGUST 2006 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 05 Jun 2019 as amended on 30 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY SERVICES AND PROJECTS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES C) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.