Dogfen lywodraethu DISABILITY ACCESS (EAST GRINSTEAD AREA)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE EAST GRINSTEAD ACCESS GROUP ARE: A) TO PROMOTE ACCESS FOR DISABLED PERSONS TO ALL PUBLIC BUILDINGS, AREAS AND FACILITIES IN THE EAST GRINSTEAD AREA; B) TO PROMOTE AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PERSONS PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING ADVICE ON THE ISSUE OF DISABLED ACCESS TO THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL.
Maes buddion
EAST AND WEST SUSSEX
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.