Dogfen lywodraethu CAMBRIDGE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/01/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CAMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
CAMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.