Dogfen lywodraethu LANCING COLLEGE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 APR 2013 as amended on 26 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER OR ELSEWHERE THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1 BY CARRYING ON THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS LANCING COLLEGE AND ANY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS ASSOCIATED WITH IT IN A MANNER WHICH DEVELOPS AND SUSTAINS A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT CENTRED ON THE ANGLICAN TRADITION OF THE EUCHARIST AND AT WHICH A FUNDAMENTAL IMPORTANCE IS ATTACHED TO THE TEACHING OF THOSE PRINCIPLES; 3.2 PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF WOODARD CORPORATION; 3.3 PROMOTING THE USE OF THE FACILITIES OF ANY SCHOOL BY THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.