Dogfen lywodraethu BRIDGES CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JAN 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 JUN 2016 as amended on 01 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MONMOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, COLOUR, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON, OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
MONMOUTH & NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.