Dogfen lywodraethu SEND AND YOU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JANUARY 2000 as amended on 17 Sep 2018 as amended on 03 Dec 2018 as amended on 06 Mar 2019 as amended on 19 Oct 2020 as amended on 17 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To promote the education of children and young people who have special educational needs and/or a disability (SEND), particularly by providing a SEND information, advice and support service for children, young people and their parents.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, NORTH SOMERSET AND BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.