Dogfen lywodraethu THE DEAN CLOSE FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE AN EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN BASED FIRMLY UPON CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL PRINCIPLES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCRIPTURES AND THE TEACHING OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE WITH THE RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO THE SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF PARENTS OF LIMITED MEANS WHO WOULD BENEFIT FROM SUCH AN EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
DEAN CLOSE MEMORIAL SCHOOL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.