Dogfen lywodraethu FREEDOM COMMUNITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/10/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE HOMELESS, IN RECOVERY FROM DRUGS AND/OR ALCOHOL DEPENDENCE, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, THROUGH PROVISION OF SAFE AND SECURE ACCOMMODATION AND REHABILITATION PROGRAMMES SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE HOMELESS, IN RECOVERY FROM DRUGS AND/OR ALCOHOL DEPENDENCE, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS, BASIC LITERACY AND NUMERACY, WORK EXPERIENCE AND VOLUNTEERING AND OTHER SUCH VOCATIONAL OR ADULT EDUCATION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. THE ABOVE OBJECTS ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.