Dogfen lywodraethu Skills and Education Group Access
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2016 as amended on 01 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBER REGION AND ELSEWHERE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.