Dogfen lywodraethu THE LEARNING CURVE VOLUNTARY SECTOR DEVELOPMENT
Rhif yr elusen: 1090735

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF CHARITY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.