Dogfen lywodraethu THE TRAILS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF EXISTING BRIDLEWAYS, BYWAYS AND OTHER PUBLIC RIGHTS OF WAY, AND THE ADDITION OF NEW BRIDLEWAYS, BYWAYS OR OTHER PUBLIC RIGHTS OF WAY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND AND WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.