THE ELIZABETH HALL CANCER CARE CHARITABLE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The provision of relief, care and treatment for anyone suffering fron cancer or related diseases and for the provisionof financial assistance to those who are in need or are suffering hardship as a result of their own illness or that of a member of their family from cancer or related diseases.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 09 Chwefror 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1089464 CANCER RESEARCH UK
- 10 Medi 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Chwefror 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.44k | £4.56k | £589 | £816 | £220 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £107.83k | £51.54k | £9.41k | £35.46k | £17.88k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 05 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2019 | 26 Chwefror 2020 | 21 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2018 | 06 Chwefror 2019 | 1 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2017 | 30 Ionawr 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH JUNE 2001, AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17TH JULY 2002 AND 2 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL ASPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (1) FOR THE PROVISION OF RELIEF, CARE AND/OR TREATMENT FOR ANYONE SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR RELATED DISEASES AND DISORDERS WHETHER BY DIRECT GRANT TO ANY SUCH SUFFERER OR BY PAYMENT TO ANY EXISTING OR FUTURE FUND, FOUNDATION, HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION, CORPORATE BODY OR TRUST ENGAGED IN SUCH RELIEF, CARE AND/OR TREATMENT. (2) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OR ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP PARTICULARLY AS A RESULT OF THEIR OWN ILLNESS OR THAT OF A MEMBER OF THEIR FAMILY FROM CANCER OR RELATED DISEASES OR DISORDERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window