Dogfen lywodraethu THE LINDALE BOWLING ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1095849

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED 6 JANUARY 2003 AND 9 JULY 2007. AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2017 as amended on 06 Feb 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LINDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
LINDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.