Dogfen lywodraethu GEOFFREY WHITWORTH THEATRE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 MAY 1988, 21 OCTOBER 1995, 16 OCTOBER 2000, 5 OCTOBER 2002, 19 JULY 2003 AND 9 OCTOBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN , IMPROVE, AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, ARTISTIC TASTE IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, DRAMA, MUSIC AND SINGING AND WITHIN SUCH OBJECTS MAKE PARTICULAR PROVISION FOR EDUCATIONAL AND COMMUNITY PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.