Dogfen lywodraethu BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 MAY 2004 AND 22 JANUARY 2008 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUL 2023 as amended on 06 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BARNSLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
THE COMMUNITY IN BARNSLEY METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.