VEOLIA HAVERING RIVERSIDE MAINTENANCE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To provide funding to organisations based in the Havering and Essex area that will deliver projects that have a community benefit, to help alleviate poverty, improve social cohesion and improve the health and wellbeing of residents affected by the landfill site in Rainham.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Essex
- Havering
Llywodraethu
- 24 Ebrill 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1064144 THE VEOLIA ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST
- 08 Ionawr 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Ebrill 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- CHRMMT (Enw gwaith)
- THE CLEANAWAY HAVERING RIVERSIDE MAINTENANCE TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- VEOLIA ES CLEANAWAY HAVERING RIVERSIDE MAINTENANCE TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £20.07k | £16.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.39m | £2.08m | £249.69k | £64.49k | £20.96k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 07 Ebrill 2024 | 67 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 31 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 31 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 31 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEM & ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 04/07/2003 AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/05/2007 & 24/08/2010, AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31/03/2009 & 30/09/2009, NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED 03/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2019 as amended on 09 Nov 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHIN THE MINIMUM PRESCRIBED TIMETABLE THROUGH THE: 3.1 PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY RESTORING OR RECLAIMING LAND WHICH CAN OTHERWISE BE USED FOR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL PURPOSES BY REASON OF POLLUTION DAMAGE CAUSED BY AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. 3.2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.2.1 PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANY POTENTIAL CAUSES OF POLLUTION IN RELATION TO ANY LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND; AND 3.2.2 REMEDYING OR MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF ANY POLLUTION IN RELATION TO LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. 3.3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.3.1 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES; AND 3.3.2 CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH (IN THIS ARTICLE, “SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES” SHALL MEAN WASTE MINIMISATION, MINIMISATION OF POLLUTION AND HARMFUL WASTE, RE-USE OF WASTE, WASTE RECOVERY ACTIVITIES AND CLEARANCE OF POLLUTANTS FROM CONTAMINATED LAND). 3.4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.4.1 THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND OR OPEN SPACE; OR 3.4.2 THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE PROVIDED THAT ANY PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND, OPEN SPACE OR PUBLIC AMENITY PROVIDED, MAINTAINED, OR IMPROVED BY VIRTUE OF THIS ARTICLE SHALL NOT BE OPERATED FOR PROFIT. (IN THIS ARTICLE, “LANDFILL SITE” SHALL HAVE THE MEANING ASCRIBED BY SECTION 66 OF THE FINANCE ACT 1996). PROVIDED THAT, AS REQUIRED BY REGULATION 33 OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996, THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN THIS ARTICLE SHALL BE DEEMED NOT TO EXTEND TO THE CARRYING OUT OF WORKS WHICH AT THE TIME THEY ARE CARRIED OUT ARE REQUIRED WHOLLY OR PARTLY TO BE CARRIED OUT BY A NOTICE OR ORDER WITHIN THE MEANING OF REGULATION 33(4) OR A RELEVANT CONDITION AS DEFINED BY REGULATION 33(10), OR (IN THE CASE OF ARTICLES 3.1 AND 3.2) THE ACCRUAL OF ANY BENEFIT TO ANY PERSON WHO HAS CARRIED OUT OR KNOWINGLY PERMITTED THE PREVIOUS USE IN QUESTION, OR (IN THE CASE OF ARTICLE 3.4) THE OPERATION OF ANY SUCH PUBLIC PARKS OR OTHER PUBLIC AMENITIES OR FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH A VIEW TO PROFIT. 3.5 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF A BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE WHICH: 3.5.1 IS A PLACE OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OR OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST 3.5.2 IS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, AND 3.5.3 IS SITUATED IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, PROVIDED THAT PARAGRAPH (6) OF THE REGULATION 33 (2) OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 (AS AMENDED) IS COMPLIED WITH. 3.6 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE CONSERVATION OR PROMOTION OF BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY BY: 3.6.1 THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION OR ENHANCEMENT OF A NATURAL HABITAT IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, OR 3.6.2 THE MAINTENANCE OR RECOVERY OF A SPECIES IN ITS NATURAL HABITAT, ON LAND OR IN WATER IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, PROVIDED THAT PARAGRAPH (3A) OF THE REGULATION 33 (2) OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 (AS AMENDED) IS COMPILED WITH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HAVERING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window