Dogfen lywodraethu THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/1927 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO DO ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING THINGS IF AND SO FAR AS ALLOWED BY LAW AND OBSERVING AND PERFORMING WHATEVER MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW IN ORDER TO CARRY OUT SUCH OBJECTS, NAMELY: TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE WORK AND PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD.
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.