Dogfen lywodraethu everyFAMILY Limited

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
INCORPORATED 29/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/11/2011 as amended on 05 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN FROM THE AREA OF BENEFIT (BEING THE CITY OF BRISTOL) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF NURSERY AND PRE-SCHOOL CARE AND FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION, EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN. 2. TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND FAMILY SUPPORT. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Maes buddion
DEFINED AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.