Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNET WATCH FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2013 as amended on 27 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROMOTION OF THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY WORKING TO MINIMISE THE AVAILABILITY OF POTENTIALLY ILLEGAL OR OTHERWISE HARMFUL CONTENT ON THE INTERNET. (B) THE PREVENTION OF CRIMES RELATING TO OFFENCES INVOLVING EXPOSURE TO ILLEGAL CONTENT ON THE INTERNET IN PARTICULAR BY: (I) OPERATING A HOTLINE ENABLING THE PUBLIC TO REPORT SUCH INSTANCES; (II) OPERATING A NOTICE AND TAKEDOWN SERVICE TO ALERT HOSTING SERVICE PROVIDERS OF SUCH CRIMINAL CONTENT FOUND ON THEIR SERVERS; AND (III) ALERTING RELEVANT LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES TO THE CONTENT. (C) TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AN WALES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WORLDWIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.