Dogfen lywodraethu KENT MUSIC
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2011 as amended on 22 Jun 2018 as amended on 05 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') SHALL BE THE PROMOTION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS IN ALL ITS FORMS AND IN PARTICULAR MUSIC AND FOR THIS PURPOSE TO PROVIDE EDUCATION TUITION AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY PRINCIPALLY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT WHICH SHALL INCLUDE THE MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY.
Maes buddion
PRINCIPALLY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT, INCLUDING THE MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.