Dogfen lywodraethu City of Wrexham Brass Band

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2017 as amended on 31 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE MUSICAL ARTS AND IN PARTICLAR BRASS BAND PLAYING BOTH IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF CHIRK, NORTH WALES AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY WHEREVER POSSIBLE. 2. TO TAKE PART IN BRASS BAND CONTESTS, WHENEVER POSSIBLE, IN ORDER TO BOTH PROMOTE THE BAND AND TO ENSURE THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THE BAND. 3. TO RETAIN THE HERITAGE OF MINERS BRASS BANDS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SHROPSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.