Dogfen lywodraethu HARROW COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JAN 2024 as amended on 12 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the charity are to provide relief (including through provision of a community transport service), for those who live or work in Harrow and other London Boroughs, who are in need because of age, sickness or disability (mental or physical) or poverty or a lack of availability of adequate and safe public transport services.
Maes buddion
HARROW AND OTHER LONDON BOROUGHS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.