Dogfen lywodraethu STUDENT HUBS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2014 as amended on 24 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM REGARDING ISSUES ENCOUNTERED BY OR AFFECTING THE DEVELOPING WORLD OR THOSE WITHIN THE CHARITY SECTOR; 3.1.2 TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION WITHIN VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS IN SO FAR AS SUCH ORGANISATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS ARE WORKING TO ADVANCE CHARITABLE PURPOSES; 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS IN SO FAR AS SUCH ORGANISATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS ARE WORKING TO ADVANCE CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
OXFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.