Dogfen lywodraethu PRESTON NORTH END COMMUNITY AND EDUCATION TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 NOV 2016 as amended on 16 May 2025 as amended on 23 Jan 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. Objects The Objects of the Charity are: 1.1. the advancement of education (including social and physical training) of people in the North West in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, including by (but without prejudice to generality of the foregoing) the provision of bespoke qualifications and degree qualifications, courses, facilities and classes for learning and development as well as the provision of training courses and programmes; 1.2. the advancement of health by (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) conducting blood pressure testing, the provision of health and wellbeing activities and initiatives such as weight management courses and the promotion of healthy lifestyles; 1.3. the relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage; and 1.4. to provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Maes buddion
THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.