Dogfen lywodraethu ALL ABOUT AUDIENCES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/05/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
'THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES IN ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING: A) ADVICE, TRAINING AND INFORMATION; AND B) OTHER ASSISTANCE DESIGNED TO INCREASE THE QUALITY AND LEVEL OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE ARTS AND TO DEVELOP EXPERTISE AND GOOD PRACTICE IN RELATION TO THIS.
Maes buddion
NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.