Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE WORCESTER AND HEREFORDSHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/01/2014 as amended on 03 Dec 2020 as amended on 20 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WORCESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
IN AND AROUND WORCESTER CITY AND ELSEWHERE IN HEREFORDSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, SHROPSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE AND THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICTS OF BIRMINGHAM, COVENTRY, DUDLEY, SANDWELL, SOLIHULL, WALSALL AND WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.