Dogfen lywodraethu SANDS CYMRU (HARM REDUCTION) LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM OR CONCERNED WITH THE EFFECTS OF DRUG AND/OR ALCOHOL MISUSE FOR THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS CAUSED THEREBY; ALSO THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN WALES.
Maes buddion
WEST GLAMORGAN.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.